U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00054-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McCann
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Judgment - Revocation Proceedings]
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • March 15, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 14, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 10, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Judgment - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 18, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 05, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 04, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • October 04, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 04, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • September 29, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • September 29, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 29, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • September 29, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 28, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 28, 2021: [Arrest]
August, 2021
  • August 12, 2021: [Transfer In/Probationer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.