U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00314-3
  • Case Name: USA v. SEALED
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 23, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • August 23, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 23, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • August 23, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • August 23, 2021: [Text Order]
  • August 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • August 23, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 23, 2021: [Detention]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 23, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • August 23, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • August 23, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • August 19, 2021: [Exhibit List ]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • August 19, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • August 18, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 18, 2021: [Text Order]
  • August 18, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • August 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 18, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • August 18, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 18, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • August 18, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 18, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • August 17, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 17, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 17, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • August 17, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • August 17, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • August 16, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • August 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 16, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • August 13, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • August 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 13, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • August 13, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • August 13, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 13, 2021: [Order]
  • August 13, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • August 13, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 13, 2021: [Detention]
  • August 13, 2021: [Redacted Document]
  • August 13, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • August 13, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • August 13, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • August 13, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 12, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • August 12, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 12, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • August 12, 2021: [Order]
  • August 12, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • August 12, 2021: [Detention]
  • August 12, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 12, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 12, 2021: [Redacted Document]
  • August 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • August 12, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • August 12, 2021: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.