U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00313-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Jordan, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Mail Returned]
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence ]
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order to Surrender]
  • November 03, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • November 02, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • November 01, 2022: [Statement Regarding Substantial Assistance]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 28, 2022: [Seal ]
  • October 28, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • October 28, 2022: [Order to Surrender]
  • October 28, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • October 26, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 05, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • September 26, 2022: [Seal ]
  • September 26, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • September 22, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • September 22, 2022: [SEALED Transcript]
  • September 22, 2022: [Transcript]
  • September 20, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • September 07, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order]
  • September 01, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Withdrawal of Motion]
  • August 31, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • August 29, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • August 29, 2022: [Seal ]
  • August 29, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • July 14, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • July 14, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 11, 2022: [Release Status Report]
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Travel ]
  • June 02, 2022: [Proposed Order]
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice of Deficiency - Failure to File Proposed Order]
  • June 01, 2022: [Travel ]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 20, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 19, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order to Surrender]
  • May 18, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • May 17, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum (NOT SEALED)]
  • May 06, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • May 05, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • April 04, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 18, 2022: [Proposed Order]
  • March 18, 2022: [Notice of Deficiency - Failure to File Proposed Order]
  • March 18, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • March 18, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 15, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • February 25, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • February 16, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • February 16, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • February 16, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • February 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 16, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 10, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • February 09, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Release Status Report]
  • January 28, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • January 18, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • January 18, 2022: [Continue ]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 16, 2021: [Release Status Report]
  • December 07, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • December 07, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 07, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • December 07, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Release Status Report]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 15, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • November 15, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 15, 2021: [Notice to Counsel]
  • November 15, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Extension of Time]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 15, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 15, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 15, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • September 15, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 13, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 10, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • September 10, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 10, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • September 10, 2021: [Notice of Special Appearance - Defendant - Non-District Counsel]
  • September 10, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 09, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 09, 2021: [Notice of Special Appearance - Defendant - Non-District Counsel]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 26, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 20, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 19, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 17, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 17, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • August 16, 2021: [Notice-other]
  • August 16, 2021: [SEALED Order]
  • August 16, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • August 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 13, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • August 13, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • August 13, 2021: [Order]
  • August 13, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • August 13, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 13, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 13, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • August 13, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • August 13, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • August 12, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.