U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00055-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stikeleather
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • February 03, 2022: [Transcript Order Acknowledgment - Appeal]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Order - Other - USCA]
  • January 19, 2022: [Case Number - USCA]
  • January 18, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal to USCA]
  • January 18, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment - USCA]
  • January 06, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • January 06, 2022: [Judgment]
  • January 06, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • January 04, 2022: [Letters of Recommendation/Support regarding Sentencing]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • December 30, 2021: [Sealed Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • December 30, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • December 30, 2021: [Seal]
  • December 28, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 20, 2021: [Response to Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 20, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 06, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • November 09, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • August 24, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • August 24, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • August 24, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • August 24, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • August 24, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 24, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 24, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 16, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • August 16, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 13, 2021: [Information Pursuant to Title 21]
  • August 13, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • August 13, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 13, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.