U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00301-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ALMOND et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Rescheduling]
December, 2024
  • December 31, 2024: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Offender Under Supervision]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • September 21, 2022: [Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [SEALED Order on SEALED Motion]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • August 30, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • August 30, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • August 22, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • August 05, 2022: [SEALED Motion]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 14, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • June 23, 2022: [Exhibit List ]
  • June 22, 2022: [Witness List]
  • June 10, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Revised Final]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Order Continuing Sentencing]
  • May 17, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • May 12, 2022: [SEALED Motion]
  • May 05, 2022: [Sentencing]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • April 28, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • April 27, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 21, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 12, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • April 07, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • April 07, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order]
  • April 06, 2022: [SEALED Motion]
  • April 05, 2022: [SEALED Notice of Apparent Violation]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 15, 2022: [Order]
  • March 10, 2022: [Motions No Longer Submitted]
  • March 10, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 07, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • February 24, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 22, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • February 11, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2022
  • January 04, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • January 03, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 23, 2021: [Notice-Other]
  • December 14, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 13, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 13, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • December 10, 2021: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • December 10, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order Continuing Trial Date]
  • December 08, 2021: [SEALED Motion]
  • December 08, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • December 07, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion ]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • December 06, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 06, 2021: [SEALED Motion]
  • December 03, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 01, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • November 22, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order]
  • November 16, 2021: [SEALED Order on SEALED Motion]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • November 16, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • November 16, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 15, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 15, 2021: [Motions Referred]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • October 28, 2021: [SEALED Motion]
  • October 28, 2021: [Amend]
  • October 28, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 28, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • October 22, 2021: [SEALED Order]
  • October 21, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 21, 2021: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • October 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • October 20, 2021: [SEALED Notice of Apparent Violation]
  • October 20, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 19, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 18, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 18, 2021: [SEALED Motion]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 15, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • September 15, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 15, 2021: [SEALED Notice of Apparent Violation]
  • September 08, 2021: [Appearance Bond]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 08, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • September 08, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 08, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • September 08, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 08, 2021: [Arrest]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • August 31, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.