U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00216-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pair
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Report to BOP]
  • November 15, 2022: [Extension of Time to Report to BOP]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 26, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Notice Regarding Passport]
  • July 29, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • July 29, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 27, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • July 27, 2022: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • July 22, 2022: [Letters of Recommendation/Support regarding Sentencing]
  • July 21, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 20, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 18, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • July 15, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • July 08, 2022: [Continue Other]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Oral or Text-Only Order]
  • March 17, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • March 17, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
February, 2022
  • February 03, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 06, 2022: [Notice Regarding Passport]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Notice - Out of State Counsel]
  • December 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • December 26, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • December 26, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - one motion per atty]
  • December 16, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2021
  • November 02, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • October 28, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 28, 2021: [Bond]
  • October 28, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • October 28, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • October 28, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • October 28, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 28, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 22, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • October 18, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 13, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • October 13, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2021
  • September 10, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 09, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.