U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00074-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Martin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • April 25, 2022: [Judgment]
  • April 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 18, 2022: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • April 18, 2022: [Notice Regarding Passport]
  • April 18, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • April 04, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • April 04, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • April 04, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 08, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Order Accepting Plea]
  • October 01, 2021: [Notice Regarding Passport]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 20, 2021: [Bond]
  • September 20, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • September 20, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • September 20, 2021: [Factual Basis Certification]
  • September 20, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • September 20, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • September 20, 2021: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • September 20, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • September 17, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • September 14, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 13, 2021: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • September 13, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • September 13, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 13, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • September 13, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.