U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00228-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Holmes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Response to Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 21, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 07, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Service by Publication]
  • July 05, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • June 16, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • June 16, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • June 16, 2022: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • June 13, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 11, 2022: [Factual Basis]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 12, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 04, 2022: [Letter]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • February 08, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • December 06, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 08, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 07, 2021: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • October 07, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 07, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • October 07, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 07, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 07, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • October 07, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 07, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 07, 2021: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • October 07, 2021: [Arrest]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • September 23, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 23, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 22, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • September 22, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.