U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00349-1
  • Case Name: USA v. FRAZIER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • December 22, 2021: [Criminal Order of Dismissal]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • November 18, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 18, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • November 18, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 17, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 12, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • November 12, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • November 12, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 12, 2021: [Arrest]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • September 28, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.