U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00357-1
  • Case Name: USA v. JOHNSON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • July 11, 2022: [Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 28, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • June 24, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 24, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 17, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • June 01, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • May 18, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2022
  • February 09, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 09, 2022: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • February 07, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
  • February 03, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 01, 2022: [Status Report ]
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • January 10, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 10, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • January 03, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 22, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order]
  • December 13, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • December 08, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • December 08, 2021: [Motions Referred]
  • December 07, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 07, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • December 07, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • December 07, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 07, 2021: [Arrest]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • September 28, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.