U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00346-1
  • Case Name: USA v. JOHNSON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • October 20, 2022: [Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • September 19, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • September 12, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • September 10, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • September 08, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order Continuing Sentencing]
  • August 28, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 12, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • August 10, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 09, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 03, 2022: [Notice of Rescheduling]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 08, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 07, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • June 07, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 07, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • June 01, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 01, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
  • June 01, 2022: [Status Report ]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Detention]
  • May 02, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 25, 2022: [Order]
  • April 25, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • April 25, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 25, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • April 22, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 21, 2022: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • April 19, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted ]
  • September 29, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • September 28, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • September 28, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.