U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00121-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pickett
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Probation Report - Amendment 821 - Criminal History]
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • January 09, 2023: [Transcript - Appeal]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • December 02, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • December 02, 2022: [USCA Case Number ]
  • December 01, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • November 02, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • November 02, 2022: [Sentencing ]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Statement Regarding Substantial Assistance]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • October 04, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 26, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • August 26, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 07, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 06, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • June 15, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • June 03, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • June 02, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • June 02, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration ]
  • April 21, 2022: [Reconsideration ]
  • April 21, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • April 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 21, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 12, 2022: [Document]
  • April 12, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • April 12, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 12, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 14, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • February 14, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • February 02, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • February 01, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 20, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 01, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • November 02, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • November 01, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • October 28, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 27, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • October 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 27, 2021: [Text Order]
  • October 27, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • October 27, 2021: [Detention]
  • October 27, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 27, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 27, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • October 27, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • October 25, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 25, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • October 20, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • October 20, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • October 20, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • October 20, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • October 20, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.