U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00261-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pelayo Estrada
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 12, 2025: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • May 12, 2025: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • May 12, 2025: [Plea Hearing]
  • May 12, 2025: [Factual Basis]
  • May 08, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 05, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • May 05, 2025: [Waiver of Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 05, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 01, 2025: [Factual Basis]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Speedy Trial]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 09, 2025: [Reply to Response]
  • April 02, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Dismiss/Speedy Trial]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • October 20, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.