U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00260-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Blinco
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • October 04, 2024: [Judgment]
  • October 04, 2024: [Exhibit]
  • October 04, 2024: [Sentencing]
  • October 04, 2024: [Plea Hearing]
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • January 13, 2023: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 14, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
  • November 14, 2022: [Seal]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • October 11, 2022: [Seal]
  • October 06, 2022: [Strike]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 13, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
  • September 13, 2022: [Seal]
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • August 11, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
  • August 11, 2022: [Seal]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Sealed Order]
  • July 18, 2022: [Competency Hearing]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 12, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
  • July 12, 2022: [Seal]
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 06, 2022: [Psychiatric Report]
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 12, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
  • May 12, 2022: [Seal]
  • May 12, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 09, 2022: [Oral or Text-Only Order]
  • May 09, 2022: [Sealed Document]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • April 14, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • April 14, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
  • April 14, 2022: [Seal]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • March 17, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
  • March 17, 2022: [Seal]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • January 18, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • November 17, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • November 04, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 03, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • November 03, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • November 03, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 03, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • November 03, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • November 03, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 03, 2021: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • November 03, 2021: [Arrest]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • October 22, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 20, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • October 20, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.