U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00258-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kelly
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • September 30, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 28, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • September 26, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • September 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 16, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • September 16, 2022: [Response to Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 01, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Service by Publication]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 25, 2022: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • May 25, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • May 25, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • May 25, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • May 17, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • April 29, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 13, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • January 17, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • December 30, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 30, 2021: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • December 30, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • December 29, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • December 29, 2021: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • December 13, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 13, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 13, 2021: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • December 13, 2021: [Arrest - Other District]
  • December 03, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 20, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • October 20, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.