U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00257-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Shepherd
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [Letter]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
  • March 18, 2025: [Letter]
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Sentencing]
  • January 25, 2023: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 25, 2023: [Dismiss]
  • January 24, 2023: [Letters of Recommendation/Support regarding Sentencing]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • October 26, 2022: [Continue Other]
  • October 13, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 10, 2022: [Response to Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 04, 2022: [Letter]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 25, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 12, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 06, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 15, 2022: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • June 15, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • June 15, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • June 15, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • June 13, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 13, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • June 13, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 12, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • February 18, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • November 10, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • November 10, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 10, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • November 10, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • November 08, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 08, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 08, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • November 08, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 08, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 08, 2021: [Arrest]
  • November 05, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • October 22, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 20, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • October 20, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.