U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00256-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Slowe
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 15, 2025: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order of Instructions]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [Screening Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Vacate (2255)]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 07, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2022
  • May 22, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • April 05, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • April 05, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 29, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 29, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • March 01, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • December 20, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • December 20, 2021: [Status Conference]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • November 04, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 04, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • November 04, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • November 04, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • November 04, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 04, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • November 04, 2021: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • November 04, 2021: [Arrest]
  • November 02, 2021: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • October 21, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 20, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • October 20, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.