U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00255-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Giles
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • November 04, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 03, 2022: [Sentencing]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • October 27, 2022: [Sealed Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • October 27, 2022: [Seal Document]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 21, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 09, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • July 19, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • July 19, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • July 13, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 13, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 13, 2022: [Factual Basis]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 14, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 14, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • February 09, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • December 07, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • December 06, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • December 06, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 06, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • December 06, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 06, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • December 06, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 06, 2021: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • December 06, 2021: [Arrest]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • November 15, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 09, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • November 08, 2021: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • October 21, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 20, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • October 20, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.