U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00254-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lopez-Resendiz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 16, 2023: [Transcript Order Acknowledgment - Appeal]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order - Other - USCA]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Case Number - USCA]
  • December 29, 2022: [Transmission of Motion to USCA]
  • December 28, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 28, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal to USCA]
  • December 28, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment - USCA]
  • December 20, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • December 20, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 14, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 14, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • December 08, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Service by Publication]
  • September 09, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 07, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 12, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • June 24, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • June 24, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • June 24, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • June 24, 2022: [Inquiry into Status of Counsel]
  • June 24, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 16, 2022: [Inquiry of Counsel]
  • June 13, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • June 13, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 08, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • February 15, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • December 01, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • October 27, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • October 27, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 27, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • October 25, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 20, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.