U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00253-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Baldwin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence]
December, 2024
  • December 24, 2024: [Extension of Time to Report to BOP]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • January 23, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • January 10, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 03, 2023: [Response in Opposition]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 16, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • December 09, 2022: [Acquittal]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time re: Other]
  • December 01, 2022: [Extension of Time re: Other]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Jury Verdict]
  • November 14, 2022: [Acquittal]
  • November 14, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • November 14, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order Returning Trial Exhibits]
  • November 09, 2022: [Memorandum]
  • November 08, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • November 08, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 08, 2022: [Jury Trial]
  • November 07, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • November 07, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • November 07, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • November 04, 2022: [Witness List]
  • November 04, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • November 04, 2022: [Memorandum]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Notice of Intent to Use Evidence - Government]
  • October 31, 2022: [In Limine]
  • October 24, 2022: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • October 24, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • October 22, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 10, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 01, 2022: [In Limine]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 27, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • July 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 20, 2022: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • July 20, 2022: [Indictment]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Discovery]
  • May 26, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • May 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 14, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • February 10, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 04, 2022: [Notice Regarding Passport]
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • December 09, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • November 23, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 22, 2021: [Bond]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • November 22, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • November 22, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 22, 2021: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • November 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 09, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • October 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 20, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.