U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00252-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Harrell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Prob12B Order Modifying Conditions/Term of Supervision]
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • August 10, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 09, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • August 01, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
  • August 01, 2022: [Sealed Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Sealed Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 26, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • July 26, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 09, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 09, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 03, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • March 02, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • March 02, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • February 24, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • February 15, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • January 20, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 20, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • January 20, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • January 19, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 04, 2022: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • January 03, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • December 30, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 30, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 30, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • December 28, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 17, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 17, 2021: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • November 17, 2021: [Arrest - Other District]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • October 20, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.