U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00063-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Keyes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Notice of Hearing on Motion ]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • December 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • December 20, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • December 16, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • December 16, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Order to Surrender]
  • November 18, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • November 18, 2022: [Notice to Counsel]
  • November 18, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • November 17, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • November 14, 2022: [Statement Regarding Substantial Assistance]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • October 07, 2022: [Motion Hearing ]
  • October 07, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • October 03, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • September 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • September 27, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • September 27, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 24, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 26, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • July 26, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • May 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 18, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • May 02, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 02, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • May 02, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • April 20, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • April 07, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • February 16, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • February 16, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 08, 2022: [Release Status Report]
  • February 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • December 16, 2021: [Bond Hearing ]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 02, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • December 02, 2021: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 15, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • November 15, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • November 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 04, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • November 04, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 02, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 02, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • November 02, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 02, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • October 29, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 28, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • October 28, 2021: [Order]
  • October 28, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • October 28, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • October 28, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 28, 2021: [Detention]
  • October 28, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • October 28, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 27, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • October 27, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 21, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • October 21, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • October 21, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • October 21, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • October 21, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.