U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00390-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Belton
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • December 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Correct Sentence Pursuant to Rule 35a ]
  • October 14, 2022: [Correct Sentence Pursuant to Rule 35a ]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order to Surrender]
  • October 07, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 07, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • October 05, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 04, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum (NOT SEALED)]
  • October 03, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • October 03, 2022: [Reminder to Counsel - Judge Boyle]
  • October 01, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • October 01, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • September 15, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • September 12, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • August 02, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • July 15, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Document]
  • May 23, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • May 23, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • May 23, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 02, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 27, 2022: [Release Status Report]
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • February 27, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 19, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • November 19, 2021: [Notice of Deficiency]
  • November 18, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 05, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • November 05, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • November 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • November 05, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • November 04, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • November 04, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • November 03, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • November 03, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 03, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • November 03, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • November 03, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 02, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • November 02, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • November 02, 2021: [Text Order]
  • November 02, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • November 02, 2021: [Detention]
  • November 02, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 02, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • November 01, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • October 21, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • October 21, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • October 21, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • October 21, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.