U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00389-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Johansson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 05, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 22, 2025: [Dismiss ]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: [Order]
  • March 10, 2025: [2255 Letter]
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • October 03, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • October 03, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • October 03, 2022: [Transcript]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • August 15, 2022: [USCA Case Number ]
  • August 15, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • August 15, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • August 12, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 01, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 18, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 18, 2022: [Seal ]
  • July 18, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • July 14, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 11, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • March 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 08, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • January 06, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • January 06, 2022: [Continue ]
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 08, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • December 08, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 08, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
November, 2021
  • November 05, 2021: [Order]
  • November 05, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • November 05, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • November 04, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • November 03, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • November 03, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 03, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 03, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • November 02, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • November 02, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 02, 2021: [Text Order]
  • November 02, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • November 02, 2021: [Detention]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 02, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 02, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • November 01, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • October 21, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • October 21, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • October 21, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • October 21, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.