U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00388-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Oxendine
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Motion Hearing ]
  • May 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - Amendment 821 - Criminal History Category]
  • May 14, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion ]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Reduce Sentence - Amendment 821 - Criminal History Category]
November, 2021
  • November 01, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Seal ]
  • October 29, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • October 27, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • October 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 27, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 27, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • October 27, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 21, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • October 21, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • October 21, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.