U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00387-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sanchez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 21, 2023: [Continue ]
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Suppress ]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 14, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Exhibit List ]
  • August 17, 2022: [Motion Hearing ]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 20, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 14, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 12, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • July 11, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 06, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Order]
  • June 28, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • June 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 24, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 13, 2022: [Suppress ]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 16, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 13, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 13, 2022: [Extension of Time]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 13, 2022: [Extension of Time]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 14, 2022: [Extension of Time]
January, 2022
  • January 12, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 12, 2022: [Extension of Time]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 10, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 10, 2021: [Extension of Time]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • October 22, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • October 22, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • October 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • October 21, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • October 21, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • October 21, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.