U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00262-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Enrique Garcia
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • March 11, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 10, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • March 01, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2021
  • December 03, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • December 03, 2021: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • December 03, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • December 02, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 02, 2021: [Factual Basis]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • October 27, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 25, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 25, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • October 22, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 22, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • October 22, 2021: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • October 22, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 22, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • October 22, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 22, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 22, 2021: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • October 22, 2021: [Arrest]
  • October 21, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 21, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • October 21, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.