U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00263-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ortiz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • October 27, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 25, 2022: [Sentencing]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • March 28, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • March 28, 2022: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • March 25, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • March 22, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • March 18, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • February 15, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 14, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • February 14, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 14, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • February 14, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 14, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • February 14, 2022: [Arrest]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • January 25, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • October 21, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.