U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00386-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LEON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • May 04, 2022: [Judgment]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • March 20, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • March 17, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • March 08, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • February 11, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 07, 2021: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • December 06, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 29, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • November 29, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • November 08, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • November 08, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing/Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • November 08, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 08, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • November 04, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • November 04, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • November 03, 2021: [Motions Referred]
  • November 03, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 01, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • November 01, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • November 01, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 01, 2021: [Arrest]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • October 26, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.