U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00389-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ROLLINS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • August 30, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 09, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • August 07, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • August 05, 2022: [SEALED Attachments to Main Document]
  • August 05, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • August 04, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • August 02, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Revised]
  • July 19, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • July 12, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Revised]
  • July 05, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 11, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • February 11, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • February 11, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 10, 2022: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • February 10, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 09, 2022: [Order on Supplemental Amended Motion - Government]
  • February 09, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 08, 2022: [Supplemental Amended Motion - Government]
  • February 07, 2022: [SEALED Notice of Apparent Violation]
  • February 07, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 01, 2022: [Status Report ]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • January 27, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
  • January 25, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • January 21, 2022: [Motions Referred]
  • January 20, 2022: [Revocation of Probation/Supervised Release]
  • January 14, 2022: [SEALED Notice of Apparent Violation]
  • January 13, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 20, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 20, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • December 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 14, 2021: [Superseding Indictment]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • November 12, 2021: [Appearance Bond]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 12, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 12, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • November 10, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • November 08, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 04, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • November 04, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • November 04, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • October 26, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.