U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00385-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GRIER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [SEALED Transcript]
  • January 24, 2023: [Appeal Transcript]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Appeal Transcript]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order]
  • September 21, 2022: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • September 19, 2022: [Transmission of Update Item to USCA]
  • September 19, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • September 19, 2022: [Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • August 12, 2022: [Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • August 12, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 12, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
  • August 12, 2022: [Transcript - Redacted]
  • August 12, 2022: [Transcript]
  • August 04, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • August 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • July 27, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • July 26, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • July 22, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • July 22, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Revised Final]
  • July 19, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order]
  • July 18, 2022: [SEALED Order on SEALED Motion]
  • July 07, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 29, 2022: [SEALED Motion]
  • June 27, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • June 13, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 11, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • April 06, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 04, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 30, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • March 22, 2022: [Set/Reset Motion and R and R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 22, 2022: [Discovery]
  • March 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 07, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 07, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • March 04, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • March 03, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 01, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • February 28, 2022: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • February 28, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • February 28, 2022: [Oral Motion]
  • February 28, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 28, 2022: [Arrest]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • October 26, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.