U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00384-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BOYD
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [USCA Judgment]
  • January 19, 2023: [USCA Opinion]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Assembled Electronic Record Transmitted to Fourth Circuit]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Appeal Transcript]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Order]
  • July 22, 2022: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • July 21, 2022: [Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • July 21, 2022: [Notice of Appeal Without Fee Payment]
  • July 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 20, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • July 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution - Defendant]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • June 21, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 13, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • June 10, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • June 09, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • May 10, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 14, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order]
  • March 11, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 11, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • March 07, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 01, 2022: [Status Report ]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 23, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • January 24, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • January 21, 2022: [Continue Trial]
  • January 04, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • December 29, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • December 29, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 29, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • December 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • December 16, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 16, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • October 26, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.