U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00382-1
  • Case Name: USA v. OTIENO
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • August 19, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 18, 2022: [Sentencing]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • July 22, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • July 20, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • July 11, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • May 04, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 02, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • April 15, 2022: [Notice-Other]
  • April 15, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 04, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 31, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • March 30, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • March 24, 2022: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • March 24, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 24, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • March 24, 2022: [Oral Motion]
  • March 24, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 24, 2022: [Arrest]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • October 26, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.