U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00383-1
  • Case Name: USA v. PEREZ
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Probation Petition 12B]
  • March 25, 2025: [Case Referred to Judge]
  • March 21, 2025: [SEALED USPO PROB 12B - Modification to Conditions]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • August 31, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 09, 2022: [Sentencing]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • July 05, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • March 17, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • March 16, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 11, 2022: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • January 21, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
  • January 21, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 13, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 13, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • December 10, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • December 06, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 06, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • December 06, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • December 06, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 06, 2021: [Arrest]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • October 26, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.