U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00397-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CUNNINGHAM
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • June 14, 2022: [Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • May 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • March 01, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Suppress ]
  • January 19, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • January 13, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 13, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 13, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • December 29, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • December 22, 2021: [Suppress]
  • December 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time To File Motion]
  • December 20, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • December 20, 2021: [Extension of Time To File Motion]
  • December 06, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • December 02, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
  • December 02, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 02, 2021: [Arraignment]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 30, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 30, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • October 26, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.