U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00398-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BROWN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Supervision]
  • December 13, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • December 13, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • December 07, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Order]
  • November 24, 2021: [SEALED USPO Response - Defendant Motion for Early Term]
  • November 16, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • November 12, 2021: [Early Termination of Supervision]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Transfer In/Supervised Release/Probation Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.