U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00125-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Strong
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 16, 2023: [Notice of Hearing ]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • July 07, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • April 20, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • April 20, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • April 20, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 01, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • January 31, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • January 28, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 08, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • December 08, 2021: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • November 12, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • November 09, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • November 08, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 05, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 05, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • November 04, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • November 04, 2021: [Text Order]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • November 04, 2021: [Detention]
  • November 04, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 04, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • November 04, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 04, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • November 03, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • October 28, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • October 28, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • October 28, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • October 28, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.