U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00124-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Howard
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • July 28, 2022: [Sentencing ]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • May 12, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • March 16, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
February, 2022
  • February 27, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • January 31, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 03, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • January 03, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • January 03, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 03, 2022: [Notice of Deficiency]
  • January 03, 2022: [Extension of Time]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • December 06, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • December 03, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • December 01, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • November 30, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 30, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • November 29, 2021: [Text Order]
  • November 29, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • November 29, 2021: [Detention]
  • November 29, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • November 29, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 29, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • November 29, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 24, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 24, 2021: [Arrest ]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Amended Penalty Sheet]
  • October 28, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • October 28, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • October 28, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • October 28, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • October 28, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.