U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00123-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Burton
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 08, 2022: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 08, 2022: [SEALED Order]
  • September 08, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • September 08, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Notice to Counsel]
  • August 24, 2022: [Release Status Report]
  • August 11, 2022: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Pretrial Release]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 03, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 03, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 03, 2022: [Bond Hearing ]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Pretrial Release]
April, 2022
  • April 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • April 01, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 28, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • March 18, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • March 04, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
January, 2022
  • January 12, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • January 12, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • January 12, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • January 12, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • January 12, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • January 12, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 11, 2022: [Release Status Report]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • November 19, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • November 19, 2021: [Withdrawal of Motion]
  • November 19, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 10, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • November 10, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • November 10, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 08, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • November 08, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 04, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • November 04, 2021: [Text Order]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • November 04, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • November 04, 2021: [Detention]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 04, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 04, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • November 04, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • November 03, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • October 28, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • October 28, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • October 28, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • October 28, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.