U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00027-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Major
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • December 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • November 10, 2022: [Seal ]
  • November 10, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • October 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • September 07, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • September 07, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 07, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • September 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • August 31, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • August 31, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • August 30, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • June 24, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • June 24, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 10, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • May 10, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • April 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 08, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 07, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • March 10, 2022: [Text Order]
  • March 08, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • March 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 04, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • January 04, 2022: [Continue ]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 10, 2021: [Remark]
  • December 10, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • December 07, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • December 03, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 03, 2021: [Extension of Time]
November, 2021
  • November 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • November 05, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • November 05, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • November 03, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • November 01, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 01, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • November 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Order]
  • October 29, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • October 29, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • October 29, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 29, 2021: [Detention]
  • October 29, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • October 29, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 28, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • October 28, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 28, 2021: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.