U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00072-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Midgette
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • August 23, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • August 16, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum (NOT SEALED)]
  • August 16, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • August 04, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • August 04, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • July 22, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • July 08, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • May 17, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • May 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 17, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 17, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • May 16, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 07, 2022: [Extension of Time]
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 09, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 09, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • December 08, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 20, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • November 19, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • November 19, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • November 19, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 19, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 18, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • November 18, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 17, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • November 17, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 17, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order]
  • November 17, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 17, 2021: [Detention]
  • November 17, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 17, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • November 17, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 15, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • November 15, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 15, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 15, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • November 09, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • November 09, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • November 09, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • November 09, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • November 09, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.