U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:05-cr-00099-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Montalban, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Revocation of Supervised Release]
February, 2022
  • February 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order on Amended Motion for Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • February 02, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Amended Motion for Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • January 12, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • January 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Notice of Correction]
  • December 28, 2021: [Discovery ]
  • December 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • December 16, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • December 16, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • December 16, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • December 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 06, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • December 06, 2021: [Text Order]
  • December 06, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • December 06, 2021: [Detention]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 06, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • December 05, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • December 03, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Revocation of Probation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.