U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00280-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Castaneda
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 15, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Continue Other]
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • January 03, 2023: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 27, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 24, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 08, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 14, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • March 07, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 03, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • March 03, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 03, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • March 03, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 03, 2022: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • March 03, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 03, 2022: [Arrest]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • February 09, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • November 17, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.