U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cr-00102-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lefevers
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • November 18, 2022: [Continue Other]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 01, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • June 27, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • June 22, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 01, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • March 30, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • March 30, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • March 23, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 18, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 18, 2022: [Factual Basis]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • January 28, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • November 24, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • November 23, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • November 23, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • November 23, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 22, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • November 19, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 19, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 19, 2021: [Special Appearance]
  • November 19, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • November 18, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • November 18, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 18, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • November 18, 2021: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.