U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00146-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Godfrey
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • October 21, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • October 21, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • October 19, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • October 18, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 17, 2022: [Release Status Report]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • September 15, 2022: [Defendant Failed to Appear, Scheduled Hearing Not Held]
  • September 09, 2022: [Release Status Report]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • July 22, 2022: [Withdrawal of Motion]
  • July 22, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • July 20, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • July 19, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • July 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 18, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • July 15, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 15, 2022: [Text Order]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • July 15, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • July 15, 2022: [Detention]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 15, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 15, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 14, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 13, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 13, 2022: [Arrest ]
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • December 09, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • December 09, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • December 09, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • December 09, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.