U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00437-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ledbetter
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Document]
  • November 08, 2022: [Letter]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • September 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 09, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • September 09, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • September 09, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • August 17, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • August 02, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • June 08, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • June 08, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
March, 2022
  • March 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 09, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • March 09, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • February 14, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • February 07, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • February 07, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 04, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • February 03, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • February 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 03, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • February 02, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • February 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order]
  • February 02, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • February 02, 2022: [Detention]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 02, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • February 02, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • December 09, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • December 09, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • December 09, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • December 09, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.