U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00439-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SMALL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Order]
  • December 08, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 08, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • December 05, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 02, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • December 01, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • December 01, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • November 04, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 01, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • October 28, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 28, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • October 26, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • October 24, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • October 24, 2022: [Oral Motion]
  • October 24, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 24, 2022: [Arrest]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • December 14, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.