U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-cr-00004-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Velasquez-Perez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • May 24, 2022: [Sentencing ]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • March 09, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • February 25, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 10, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • January 05, 2022: [Indictment ]
  • January 05, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • January 05, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.