U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-cr-00002-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McIntyre
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • July 19, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • July 05, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • April 18, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • April 18, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • April 18, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 14, 2022: [Release Status Report]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • February 08, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • February 07, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • February 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 04, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • February 03, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • February 03, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order]
  • February 03, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • February 03, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • February 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 03, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 03, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • February 03, 2022: [Detention]
  • February 01, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • January 05, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • January 05, 2022: [Indictment ]
  • January 05, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • January 05, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.