U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-cr-00001-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jennings
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Objection to PSI]
  • January 16, 2023: [Objection to PSI]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • December 16, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • December 16, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • December 02, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • October 04, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • October 04, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 01, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • February 28, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • February 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • February 04, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • February 04, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 01, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • February 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 01, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 01, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • January 27, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • January 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 27, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • January 26, 2022: [Text Order]
  • January 26, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • January 26, 2022: [Detention]
  • January 26, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • January 26, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 26, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 26, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • January 25, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • January 24, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 05, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • January 05, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • January 05, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • January 05, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
  • January 05, 2022: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.